House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in House Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Senate Introduced |