House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in House Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate Introduced |