House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in House Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 22 Nay: 18 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Senate Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 29, 2022 |