Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died on Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means and re-referred to Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transparency and Ethics | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Transparency and Ethics | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Senate Introduced |