Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson, and Senator Sykes are appointed to replace Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Corson on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House Representative Thomas, Representative Estes, and Representative Stogsdill are appointed to replace Representative Owens, Representative Smith, E., and Representative Highberger on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Owens, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Highberger appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 90 Nay: 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|