LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB74
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB74
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB74
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died in Committee
Senate
03/01/2023
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
Senate
02/23/2023
Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Senate
02/02/2023
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Senate
01/23/2023
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Senate
01/20/2023
Senate Introduced