LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB88
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB88
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB88
Action History
Senate
04/30/2024
Senate Died in Committee
Senate
02/13/2023
Senate Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
Senate
01/25/2023
Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities
Senate
01/24/2023
Senate Introduced