House | 04/30/2024 | House Died on House Calendar | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Received and Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 7 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Senate Introduced |