Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Emergency Final Action - Not adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 14 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Introduced |