Senate | 03/05/2025 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 5, 2025, 8:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2025 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | House Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2025, 1:30 PM Room 112-N | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | House Introduced |