Kansas 2025-2026 Regular Session

Kansas Senate Bill SB9 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 24, 2025
Bill January 15, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025
Analysis March 6, 2025
Analysis January 30, 2025
Bill

Amended

Bill