House | 03/10/2022 | returned to Rules | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | introduced in House | ||
House | 12/09/2021 | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |