House
|
03/24/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
passed 88-5
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
passed 29-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
floor amendment (1) defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 87-4
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 31, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2021
|
Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
|
|
|