House | 04/20/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 232) | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | introduced in House |