House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
returned to Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
taken from Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
to Health & Welfare (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|