House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 129)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
passed 78-12
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Floor Amendment (2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
passed 25-11 with Floor Amendment (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
returned to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
taken from Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 73-23 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
to Judiciary (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|