Senate | 03/22/2022 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | returned to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | taken from Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | introduced in House |