House | 03/29/2022 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | returned to Rules | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | introduced in House | ||
House | 06/11/2021 | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |