Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 200)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 24-13
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 55-36
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
line items vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 76-16
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 32-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 69-17
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
taken from Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|