House | 03/08/2022 | WITHDRAWN | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/08/2022 | introduced in House |