House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 183)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 75-15
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
floor amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 82-7
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 16, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|