House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 181)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 92-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) and (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 87-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|