House | 03/29/2022 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | taken from Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | to Rules (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | introduced in House |