House | 04/08/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 180) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 32-1 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | introduced in House |