Senate | 03/25/2022 | returned to Health & Welfare (S) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | taken from Health & Welfare (S) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | to Health & Welfare (S) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 71-22 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | introduced in House | ||
House | 06/21/2021 | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |