Senate | 03/15/2022 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 75-20 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | introduced in House | ||
House | 06/25/2021 | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |