House | 03/29/2022 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | floor amendment (3) filed | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | floor amendment (2) filed | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/02/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | introduced in House |