Senate | 04/13/2022 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 88-4 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | to Agriculture (H) | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | introduced in House |