Senate | 03/03/2022 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 82-0 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | introduced in House |