Senate | 03/29/2022 | to Licensing & Occupations (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 84-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | floor amendments (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | 1st reading | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | introduced in House |