House
|
03/29/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 48)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
to Banking & Insurance (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
to Banking & Insurance (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|