House
|
03/31/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
passed 88-3
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 84-13 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 31, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
08/05/2021
|
Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
|
|
|