Senate | 03/29/2022 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 86-11 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | introduced in House |