Senate | 03/09/2022 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 96-2 | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | introduced in House |