House
|
04/22/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 237)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
passed 93-0
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 14, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
recommitted to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
floor amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Floor Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
floor amendment (1-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|