House | 04/08/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 155) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 92-4 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | introduced in House |