House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 184)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 86-4
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 33-3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Free Conference Committee Report (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 33-3 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
floor amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3-title) filed and floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 80-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|