House | 03/29/2022 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 50) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 88-1 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | introduced in House |