House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 168)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 92-2
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 95-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 03, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|