Senate | 03/22/2022 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | introduced in House |