House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 94)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 87-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|