Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
floor amendments (1)(2)(3)(4)(5)(6)(7)(8)(9) (10)(11)(12)(13)(14)(15)(16) and (17) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
reassigned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
returned to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
taken from Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 58-30 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
floor amendment (2) defeated
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (2) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|