House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 24-13 with Floor Amendment (3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Floor Amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
floor amendment (3) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
floor amendment (2) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 50-31
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
floor amendments (2) (4) (5) (6) (3-title) and (7-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|