House
|
04/25/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 238)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
passed 71-15
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
floor amendments (2) and (1-title) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 14, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 85-2
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|