House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 170)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 36-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
returned to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
taken from Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|