House
|
04/11/2022
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 192)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 28-8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
returned to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
taken from State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 75-20 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|