Senate | 03/16/2022 | to Transportation (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | floor amendment (1-title) filed | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | introduced in House |