Senate | 03/25/2022 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | introduced in House |