Senate | 03/15/2022 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | introduced in House |