House
|
04/08/2022
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 165)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
passed 92-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 97-0
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 19, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
introduced in House
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2021
|
Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
|
|
|